EP1219285 - Hair bleach composition and hair dye composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2007/13] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Takashi Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Miyabe, Hajime Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Yutaka Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Yoshiaki Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 05 /
Monda, Keiji Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 06 /
Misu, Daisuke Kao Corporation Research Labor., 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130241.1 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000400808 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000400808 | JP20000400875 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000400875 | JP20000400876 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000400876 | JP20000400877 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000400877 | JP20000402454 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000402454 | JP20010027704 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001027704 | JP20010061696 | 06.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001061696 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219285 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219285 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219285 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/39, A61Q5/08, A61Q5/10 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | A61K7/135, A61K7/13 | ||
Former IPC [2002/27] | A61K7/13, A61K7/135 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/16] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Haarbleichungs-und Haarfärbemittel | [2002/27] | English: | Hair bleach composition and hair dye composition | [2002/27] | French: | Produit de décoloration et produit de coloration capillaire | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07001323.0 / EP1813254 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3981678 (GHILARDI GIULIANA, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 28; examples 1,3-5,8-11,13,14,16-26 *; | [X]DE10008640 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US4402698 (KALOPISSIS GREGOIRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 8, line 7; examples 1,3 *; | [A]US4349532 (VANLERBERGHE GUY, et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 8, line 14; example C4 *; | [E]WO0195869 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,3,4 * the whole document * |