EP1221320 - Method of composing infusion line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMS Co., Ltd. 12-17, Kakomachi,Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 730-8652 / JP | [2002/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Kenji 22-25, Yanominami 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 736-0086 / JP | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130664.4 | 21.12.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | JP20000394867 | 26.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000394867 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221320 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221320 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, A61M5/162, A61M5/165, A61M5/168, A61M39/24, A61M1/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61M5/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/02 (EP,US);
A61M39/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/162 (EP,US);
A61M5/165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/28] | A61M5/14, A61M5/162, A61M5/165, A61M5/168, A61M39/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/17] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zusammensetzen einer Infusionsleitung | [2002/28] | English: | Method of composing infusion line | [2002/28] | French: | Procédé de composition d'une ligne de perfusion | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 01.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 22.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/20] | 17.12.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4006745 (SORENSON JAMES L, et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5743894 (SWISHER DAVID RORK [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US5807312 (DZWONKIEWICZ MARK R [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9952575 (HOCHMAN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS6395063 |