EP1228905 - Vehicle height adjustment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 3-1-1, Hinodai Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 3-1-1, Hinodai Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoshima, Kazuo c/o Hino Motors, Ltd. 3-1-1, Hinodai, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130787.3 | 22.12.2001 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010028306 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001028306 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228905 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1228905 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228905 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B60G17/0155 (EP);
B60G17/017 (EP);
B60G17/0523 (EP);
B60G2200/31 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
B60G2300/024 (EP);
B60G2300/026 (EP);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2500/202 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Höhenregelungssystems für ein Fahrzeug | [2002/32] | English: | Vehicle height adjustment device | [2002/32] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de la hauteur d'un véhicule | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 15.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.12.2007 | [2009/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9835845 (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,6,7 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph L * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph L * * page 11, paragraph L - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 12, line 30 - line 31 *; | [A]GB2317598 (MULTIDRIVE LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1,6 * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US3765692 (BARBER W, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE19801546 (KOEGEL FAHRZEUGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4618156 (KATO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 3 * * column 3, paragraph 7 * * column 4, paragraph 3 *; | [A]DE3810386 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3223140 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |