EP1156167 - Feed control device for plumbing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis, Missouri 63136 / US | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babb, Larry F. 16940 Indian Hollow Road Grafton, Ohio 44044 / US | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2001/47] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 01200097.2 | 12.01.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | US20000572748 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: US 572748 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156167 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156167 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156167 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E03F9/00, B08B9/04 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B08B9/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/39] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorschubsteuereinheit für ein Rohrreinigungsgerät | [2001/47] | English: | Feed control device for plumbing apparatus | [2001/47] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de l'avance pour dispositif de plombier | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.06.2009 | [2009/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3882565 (IRWIN LAWRENCE F, et al) [DX] 1* column 6, line 35 - line 54; figures 3,5 *; | [X]US5640736 (SALECKER ROY W [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 20; figures 2-6,9 * | by applicant | US3882565 | US4580306 | US5031263 |