EP1123695 - Oral composition comprising capsules containing keratin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2001/33] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di-Drusco, Isotta Via San Marco 18 20121 Milano / IT | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 01200154.1 | 17.01.2001 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | EP20000200280 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00200280 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1123695 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1123695 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/65 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Orale Zusammensetzungen aus Kapseln, die Keratin enthalten | [2001/33] | English: | Oral composition comprising capsules containing keratin | [2001/33] | French: | Compositions orales comprenant des capsules contenant de la kératine | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXD]WO0101938 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [PXD] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9959535 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 18 - line 27 * * page 7, line 9; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [A]EP0711544 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 5 - line 8 * * page 3, line 26 - line 27 * * page 3, line 52 - line 56 * * page 4, line 36 - line 41 * * example -; claim - *; | CN1211448 [ ] (LIU WEI [CN]); | [DA]JPH10337466 | [A] - LIU, WEI, "Enteric capsule containing bifidobacterium, yeast and other ingredients", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, URL: STN, XP002140875 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 10, Database accession no. 1999-113846, XP002140876 & JPH10337466 A 19981222 (AKUSENU KK) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * |