Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001307833 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NL1014646 | 15.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1146595 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL1014646 | 15.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL1014646C | 19.09.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | NL1014646 | 15.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG100634 | 26.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL1014646 | 15.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6648687 | 18.11.2003 | B2 | US2001036769 | 01.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL1014646 | 15.03.2000 |