EP1146595 - Method for mounting a connector on a printed circuit board, and shielded connector and lower shielding plate for use in such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International Tour Framatome, La Défense 6 92084 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otto, Nadia Europalaan 42 bus 101 2800 Mechelen / BE | 02 /
Fret, Marc Van de Perre lei 17 2660 Hoboken / BE | 03 /
Booghmans, Hubert Siozenstraat 92 1861 Meise-Wolvertem / BE | 04 /
Panis, Werner Laar 18 3980 Tessenderlo / BE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Intellectual Property Manager 145-147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/42] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 01200848.8 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | NL20001014646 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: NL 1014646 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146595 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/20 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/658 (EP,US);
H01R12/721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen eines Steckverbinders auf einer gedruckten Platte sowie abgeschirmter Steckverbinder und unterste Abschirmplatte zum Gebrauch in einem solchen Verfahren | [2001/42] | English: | Method for mounting a connector on a printed circuit board, and shielded connector and lower shielding plate for use in such a method | [2001/42] | French: | Méthode de montage d'un connecteur sur un circuit imprimé, et connecteur blindé et plaque inférieure de blindage utilisée dans une telle méthode | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 06.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5934941 (HIRAI YUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 26; figure 12 *; | [Y]US5500788 (LONGUEVILLE JACQUES [BE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 6; figures 4-8 *; | [Y]DE19640847 (AMP HOLLAND [NL]) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 62; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0893854 (MOLEX INC [US]) [Y] 11,13 * page 3, column 4, line 2 - page 4, column 5, line 40; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US5104329 (BROWN JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 28; figures 5,5A * |