EP1134187 - Process for the production of hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saipem S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | [2010/24] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanfilippo, Domenico Via S. D'Acquisto 4 20067 Paullo (Milan) / IT | 02 /
Paggini, Alberto Via Ponchielli 3 26016 Spino D'Adda (Cremona) / IT | 03 /
Piccoli, Valerio Via Pellettier 6 20052 Monza (Milan) / IT | 04 /
Miglio, Roberta Via Borzighella 3 28047 Oleggio (Novara) / IT | 05 /
Rossini, Stefano Via Danusso 10 20142 Milan / IT | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/15] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/38] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01201044.3 | 15.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI00551 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: IT MI000551 | IT2000MI02775 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: IT MI002775 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134187 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1134187 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134187 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
C01B3/386 (EP,US);
C01B3/063 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0805 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1058 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/38] | Extension states | AL | 15.03.2001 | LT | 15.03.2001 | LV | 15.03.2001 | MK | 15.03.2001 | RO | 15.03.2001 | SI | 15.03.2001 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wasserstoff | [2001/38] | English: | Process for the production of hydrogen | [2001/38] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'hydrogène | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 06.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5836901 ; | [X]GB902338 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0016648 (NIPPON MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1* page 24, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO9633794 (ENERGY & ENVIRON RES CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 6 * * page 11, line 29 - page 15, line 2 * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US6007699 (COLE JERALD A [US]) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [X]WO0000427 (U CAT B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US6025403 (MARLER DAVID OWEN [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 23 - column 10, line 33 *; | [XP]WO0056658 (PLUG POWER INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830521), vol. 007, no. 118, Database accession no. (C - 167), & JP58036901 A 19830304 (NIPPON KIHATSUYU KK) [X] 1-25 * abstract * | [X] - W K LEWIS, "Reaction of methane with copper oxide in a fluidized bed", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19490601), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 1227 - 1237, XP002094111 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie50474a018 |