EP1138893 - Method for starting and operating an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2003/11] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Cooper Cameron Corporation 515 Post Oak Blvd. Suite 1200 Houston, Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Servé, J. Vincent 2727 Wellsford Lane Springfield, Ohio 45503 / US | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Mag. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2001/40] | Akers, Noel James Akers & Co., Finchwood, Tregavethan Truro, Cornwall TR4 9EN / GB | Application number, filing date | 01201143.3 | 23.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | US20000535397 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: US 535397 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138893 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138893 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02B19/12 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
F02N9/02 (EP,US);
F02B19/12 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02F1/242 (EP,US);
F02P5/1506 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Starten und zum Betrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/40] | English: | Method for starting and operating an internal combustion engine | [2001/40] | French: | Procédé de démarrage et de fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5060610 (PARO DANIEL [FI]) [X] 1,9,17,24 * column 1, line 48 - line 60; figure 2 * * column 4, line 5 - line 13 *; | [X]DE2450305 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [X] 1,9,17,24 * page 5, line 22 - line 32 * * page 6, line 16 - line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4091772 (HEATER WILLIAM R, et al) [A] 1,9,17,24 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19741566 (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,17,24 * column 1, line 52 - line 57; figure 1 * * column 6, line 27 - line 48 *; | [DA]US5293851 (SCHAUB FREDERICK S [US]) [DA] 1,9,17,24 * column 1, line 39 - line 42; figure 1 * | [A] - BERNARD CHALLEN, RODICA BARANESCU, Diesel Engine Reference Book, WARRENDALE, PA, USA, SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, XP002200209 [A] 1,9,17,24 * 2nd Edition, Chapter 25.3, pag.615-617 * | by applicant | US4603674 | US4463734 | US4527516 | US4306526 | US4127095 | US4966103 | US5947076 | US5293851 |