EP1123651 - A method and implement of computer-controlled automatically milking animals in a milking parlour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | [2004/13] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Berg, Karel 5 Boterbloemstraat 2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | 02 /
Fransen, Renatus Ignatius Josephus 6 Prins Hendrikstraat 3135 ZD Vlaardingen / NL | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 01201342.1 | 16.03.1993 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | NL19920000582 | 30.03.1992 Original published format: NL 9200582 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1123651 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1123651 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123651 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/01, A01K11/00, A01J5/04 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
A01J5/01 (EP);
A01J5/0175 (EP);
A01J5/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/33] | A01J5/01, A01K11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen rechnergesteuerten Melken von Tieren in einer Melkanlage, | [2001/33] | English: | A method and implement of computer-controlled automatically milking animals in a milking parlour | [2001/33] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la traite, contrôlée automatiquement par ordinateur, d'animaux dans une salle de traite | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93200754.5 / EP0564023 | EP97203406.0 / EP0872175 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
06.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support P.O.Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP, et al, et al One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
06.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support P.O.Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford, et al, et al One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support P.O.Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford, et al, et al 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support P.O.Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
28.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB P O Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2005
28.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB P O Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | 13.07.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/28] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.09.2004 | IT | 08.09.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/31] | FR | 08.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4537150 (BOWERS DAVID L [US]) [A] 1,2,37,38 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3502858 (HELMIG REINHOLD) [A] 1,2,37,38 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US4569236 (KITCHEN BARRY J [AU], et al) [AD] 1,2,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0385539 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1,2,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]NL8900479 (LELY NV C VAN DER); | [PA]DE4109253 (AGRO VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT FRI [DE]) [PA] 1,2,37,38 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US4569236 | NL8900479 |