EP1154176 - Insert valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölck, Poul Vilhelmsborgvaenget 35 8330 Beder / DK | [2001/46] | Application number, filing date | 01201563.2 | 01.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000122730 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022730 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154176 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154176 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154176 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/52 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
F16K1/523 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/46] | Title | German: | Einbauventil | [2001/46] | English: | Insert valve | [2001/46] | French: | Soupape insérable | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 16.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | BE | 03.03.2004 | CH | 03.03.2004 | CY | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | FR | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | LI | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | TR | 03.03.2004 | LU | 01.05.2004 | IE | 04.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
IT | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3300623 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [AD] 1 * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE8911899U (METALLWERKE NEHEIM GOEKE & CO. GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4411013 (GAMPPER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4407373 (OVENTROP SOHN KG F W [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 59 ** figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE4442744 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 4 * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE3300623 | DE4442744 |