EP1155962 - Packaging tube forming-,filling-,and sealing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shikoku Kakoki Co., Ltd. 10-1, Aza-Nishinokawa Tarohachizu Kitajima-cho Itano-gun Tokushima 771-0287 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Shikoku Kakoki Co., Ltd. 10-1, Aza-Nishinokawa, Tarohachisu, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0287 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kume, Satoshi, c/o Shikoku Kakoki Co., Ltd. 10-1, Aza-Nishinokawa, Tarohachizu, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0287 / JP | 02 /
Arao, Takashi, c/o Shikoku Kakoki Co., Ltd. 10-1, Aza-Nishinokawa, Tarohachizu, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0287 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Michio, c/o Shikoku Kakoki Co., Ltd. 10-1, Aza-Nishinokawa, Tarohachizu, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0287 / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooibureau Postbus 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01201714.1 | 10.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000143232 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000143232 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155962 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/20 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B65B9/213 (EP,US);
B65B37/00 (EP,US);
B65B51/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zum Herstellen, Füllen und Verschliessen von Verpackungsschläuchen | [2001/47] | English: | Packaging tube forming-,filling-,and sealing machine | [2001/47] | French: | Machine pour la fabrication, le remplissage, et la fermeture d'un tube d'emballage | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5782344 (EDWARDS JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 29; figures 7,8 * [Y] 2-4,6,7; | [Y]US4566249 (SCHWERDTEL ERNST [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 8 - line 61; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2098874 (PREPAC SARL) [Y] 3 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 10; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]FR2250676 (SERES ETUDES REALISA EMBALLAG [FR]) [Y] 4 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [Y]US4227627 (BENNETT RICHARD N) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 38 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5822949 (NAOI MITUO [JP]) [Y] 7 * column A * * column 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure 3 * |