EP1157849 - Ink jet printing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Missell, Gregory E., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Suminski, Christine, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Honoré, Anne-Claire, et al Kodak Industrie Département Brevets C.R.T. 60/2 Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Honoré, Anne-Claire, et al Kodak Industrie Département Brevets C.R.T. 60/2 Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/48] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01201773.7 | 14.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | US20000579591 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: US 579591 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157849 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157849 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41J2/01 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/33] |
Former [2001/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldruckverfahren | [2001/48] | English: | Ink jet printing process | [2001/48] | French: | Procédé pour l'impression par jet d'encre | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06286296 ; | [A]JPH02243382 ; | [X]US4460637 (MIYAMOTO SHIGEHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 5 - column 49, line 64 *; | [A]EP0262983 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US4780356 (OTOUMA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3832112 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5024987 (KLUG GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] * column 14, lines 1-12 *; | [A]EP0780237 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06286296 A 19941011 (NEW OJI PAPER CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901218), vol. 014, no. 570, Database accession no. (M - 1060), & JP02243382 A 19900927 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US4239543 | US4381946 | US4781758 | US5522968 | US5635297 |