Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
21.05.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
14.05.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
10.03.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
22.11.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
30.10.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
29.10.2002 | Change - extension states | |
11.10.2002 | Change - representative | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
28.06.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
21.06.2002 | First examination report | |
20.06.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
17.05.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
12.10.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] |