EP1163919 - Protection device for medical needles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.G.M. S.P.A. 22-24 Via Modena 42015 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parmigiani, Corrado Saverio c/o C.G.M. S.P.A., 22/24, Via Modena 42015 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Studio Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. 4, Via Dante Alighieri 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 01201985.7 | 28.05.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | IT2000RE00064 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: IT RE000064 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1163919 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1163919 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61M25/0625 (EP,US);
A61M5/3275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für medizinische Nadeln | [2001/51] | English: | Protection device for medical needles | [2001/51] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour aiguilles médicales | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 17.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5951525 (THORNE DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 34; figures 1-4,11,12 * [Y] 14-16; | [YA]EP0534000 (NICOLETTI PIO [IT], et al) [Y] 14 * column 5, lines 39-51; figure 11 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 50; figures 24-26 * [A] 1; | [Y]US5112311 (UTTERBERG DAVID S [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * column 9, lines 46-62; figure 12 *; | [X]US4935013 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-13 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 62; figures 1-5 * |