EP1172029 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 ZUG / CH | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG 20 Bützenweg 6300 ZUG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Berg, Karel 5 Boterbloemstraat 2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | 02 /
Fransen, Renatus Ignatius Josephus 6 Prins Hendrikstraat 3155 ZD Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
van der Lely, Alexander 44 Jan Witkampstraat 3065 NA Rotterdam / NL | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 01202224.0 | 11.06.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | NL20001015671 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: NL 1015671 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1172029 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172029 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/017, A01K5/01 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01K1/12 (EP,US);
A01K5/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/03] | Title | German: | Konstruktion zum automatischen Melken von Tieren | [2002/03] | English: | A construction for automatically milking animals | [2002/03] | French: | Construction pour la traite automatique d'animaux | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 22.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | BE | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | IT | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | TR | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.03.2006 | ES | 25.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | LU | 11.06.2006 | IE | 12.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
LU | 11.06.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0320496 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 22 - line 63 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9313651 (PROLION BV [NL]) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0647390 (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC [AN]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 8 - line 22 * * figure -; claim - * |