EP1125505 - Eviscerator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Numafa Holding B.V. Edisonstraat 1 3281 NC Numansdorp / NL | [2009/07] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Systemate Group B.V. Edisonstraat 1-3 3281 NC Numansdorp / NL | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states SYSTEMATE HOLLAND B.V. Burgemeester de Zeeuwstraat 52 NL-3281 AK Numansdorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazenbroek, Jacobus Eliza Danzerweg 2 3286 LH KLAASWAAL / NL | 02 /
Verrijp, Bastiaan Vrijthofflaan 3 3281 SG NUMANSDORP / NL | 03 /
Van Ham, Johannes Teunes Jan Wieldrechtse zeedijk 24 3329 KT Dordrecht / NL | 04 /
Mackloet, Daniel Lijte Dubbele ring 20 3245 AD Sommelsdijk / NL | [2004/19] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
Hazenbroek, Jacobus Eliza Burgemeester de Zeeuwstraat 52 3281 AK Numansdorp / NL | ||
02 /
Verrijp, Bastiaan Burgemeester de Zeeuwstraat 103 3281 AK Numansdorp / NL | |||
03 /
Van Ham, Johannes Teunes Jan Wieldrechtse zeedijk 24 3329 KT Dordrecht / NL | |||
04 /
Mackloet, Daniel Lijte Dubbele ring 20 3245 AD Sommelsdijk / NL | Representative(s) | Geurts, Franciscus Antonius, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Geurts, Franciscus Antonius, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/07] | Geurts, Franciscus Antonius, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/34] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01202275.2 | 30.10.1996 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125505 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1125505 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125505 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1125505 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/06 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
A22C21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/36] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausnehmer | [2001/34] | English: | Eviscerator | [2001/34] | French: | Eviscérateur | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96203009.4 / EP0839455 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2005
15.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE STORK PMT B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV BOXMEER / NL Opponent's representative Dorna, Peter, et al, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2005
15.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE STORK PMT B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV BOXMEER / NL Opponent's representative Dorna, Peter, et al, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | 18.03.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.10.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.02.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0400696 (MEYN MASCHF [NL]) [A] 1-4,6,13,14 * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 9 *; | [DA]US3886635 (MEYN PIETER) [DA] 1-3,6,11,13,14 * column W *; | [A]US3979793 (HAZENBROEK JACOBUS E) [A] 1,3,13,14 * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 66; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0497014 (MEYN MASCHF [NL]) [A] 1,6,13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2239947 (STORK BRABANT BV [NL]) [A] 7,11,12 * page 4, line 8 - line 25 *; | [A]EP0094724 (STORK PMT [NL]); | [A]EP0539134 (LINCO ENGINEERING PTY LIMITED [AU]); | [A]GB356442 (DRAW TRIM CORP OF AMERICA); | [DA]EP0587253 (STORK PMT [NL]) | by applicant | BE813138 |