Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
17.09.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
13.07.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.08.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.03.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
05.03.2003 | Change - extension states | |
21.02.2003 | First examination report | |
19.02.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
15.11.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
18.10.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
15.02.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |