Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005288055 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | US89143001 | 26.06.2001 | US21819705 | 01.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2811133 | 04.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2823937 | 25.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020002265 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002055737 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1193953 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2004 | B1 | EP1193953 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1333621 | 30.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60106839T | 15.12.2005 | T2 | DE60106839D1 | 09.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW580820B | 21.03.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6963756 | 08.11.2005 | B2 | US2002006813 | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0008540 | 30.06.2000 | FR0105504 | 24.04.2001 |