EP1170435 - Eave ventilation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ubbink B.V. Verhuellweg 9 6984 AA Doesburg / NL | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Ubbink B.V. P.O. Box 15 1800 AA Alkmaar / NL | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states UBBINK NEDERLAND B.V. Verhuellweg 9 NL-6984 AA Doesburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Schellebeek, Dirk Johannes Markiezenhof 8 6715 LK Ede / NL | [2006/12] |
Former [2002/02] | 01 /
van Schellenbeek, Dirk Johannes Markiezenhof 8 6715 LK Ede / NL | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01202554.0 | 04.07.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | NL20001015616 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: NL 1015616 | [2002/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170435 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170435 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170435 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/17 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
E04D13/178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [2002/40] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lüftungsvorrichtung für Dachtraufe | [2002/02] | English: | Eave ventilation device | [2002/02] | French: | Dispositif de ventilation de rive de toit | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 17.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.08.2006 | [2007/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0340856 (UBBINK NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [Y] 1-17 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 17; figure - *; | [Y]FR2539787 (GOUBAUD MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]EP0952274 (MAGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0203670 (REDLAND BREDERO BV [NL]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO9734062 (POLYSHEET AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * |