EP1275664 - Linear high density polyethylene resins and films, methods and systems for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2005/42] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC. World Houston Plaza, 15710 JFK Blvd. Houston, Texas 77032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gray, Steven D. 2019 Barrington Pointe Road League City, Texas 77573 / US | 02 /
Knoeppel, David W. 444 E. Medical Center Blvd. no. 314 Webster, Texas 77062 / US | 03 /
Coffy, Tim J. 14803 Grand Nuggett Court Houston, Texas 77062 / US | 04 /
Goins, Mike 11502 Eaglewood Houston Texas 77089 / US | 05 /
McLeod, Michael 2601 N. Repsdorph Road 1906 Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | 06 /
DeKunder, Greg 3403 W. Overdale Pearland, Texas 77584 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
Gray, Steven D. 2019 Barrington Pointe Road League City, Texas 77573 / US | ||
02 /
Knoeppel, David W. 444 E. Medical Center Blvd. no. 314 Webster, Texas 77062 / US | |||
03 /
Coffy, Tim J. 14803 Grand Nuggett Court Houston, Texas 77062 / US | |||
04 /
Goins, Mike 11502 Eaglewood Houston Texas 77089 / US | |||
05 /
McLeod, Michael 2601 N. Repsdorph Road # 1906 Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | |||
06 /
DeKunder, Greg 3403 W. Overdale Pearland, Texas 77584 / US | |||
Former [2003/03] | 01 /
Gray, Steven D. 2019 Barrington Pointe Road League City, Texas 77573 / US | ||
02 /
Knoeppel, David W. 444 E. Medical Center Blvd. no. 314 Webster, Texas 77062 / US | |||
03 /
Coffy, Tim J. 14803 Grand Nuggett Court Houston, Texas 77062 / US | |||
04 /
Goins, Mike 5000 Lakehill Drive Frisco, Texas 75034 / US | |||
05 /
McLeod, Michael 2601 N. Repsdorph Road # 1906 Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | |||
06 /
DeKunder, Greg 3403 W. Overdale Pearland, Texas 77584 / US | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2003/03] | Leyder, Francis, et al Atofina Research S.A. Pat. Dept., Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 01202566.4 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1275664 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275664 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08F110/02 (EP);
C08J2323/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/02, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/06, C08F2500/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | Lineare Polyethylenharze und Polyethylenschichten mit hoher Dichte, Verfahren und Systeme zu deren Herstellung | [2005/30] | English: | Linear high density polyethylene resins and films, methods and systems for making same | [2003/03] | French: | Resines et films de polyethylene lineaire haute densite, leurs procedes et systemes de fabrication | [2003/03] |
Former [2003/03] | Lineare polyethylenharze und polyethylenschichte mit hoher dichte, verfahren und systeme zu deren herstellung | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 13.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | FR | 21.02.2007 | IT | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | DE | 22.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | ES | 01.06.2007 | IE | 03.07.2007 | LU | 03.07.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
LU | 03.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
DE | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 21.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0729978 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [X] 1-21* the whole document *; | [X]US5710224 (ALT HELMUT G [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [DX]US6110549 (HAMADA NAOSHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-21 * the whole document * |