EP1152616 - Asymmetric data communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation Suite 501, 824 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Bellsouth Intellectual Property Corporation Suite 501, 824 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states BELLSOUTH CORPORATION 1155 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30309-3610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arias, Salvador Luis 2899 Greystone Cove Chamblee, Georgia 30341 / US | 02 /
Comer, Edward Irby 4688 Amberwood Trail Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | 03 /
Dunn, Roy Curtis 4050 Oak Hill Road Douglasville, Georgia 30135 / US | 04 /
Frerking, Melvin Duane 2566 Bailey Drive Norcross, Georgia 30071 / US | 05 /
Danner, Fred Thomas III 2850 Lake Wind Court Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US | 06 /
Bergen, Richard Sammis Jr. 2875 Laurel Green Court Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | 07 /
Elliot, Sidney Walker 7685 Brigham Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30350 / US | 08 /
Evans, Thomas Franklin 2079 Mountain Creek Road Stone Mountain, Georgia 30087-1030 / US | 09 /
Chambers, Craig Brent 171 Glenloch Parkway Stockbridge, Georgia 30281 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01202637.3 | 23.05.1996 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | US19950447537 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: US 447537 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152616 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152616 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04H20/02 (KR);
H04N21/236 (KR);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/6118 (EP,US);
H04N21/6187 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17309 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Asymmetrisches Datenübertragungssystem | [2001/45] | English: | Asymmetric data communications system | [2001/45] | French: | Système asymétrique de communication de données | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 25.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96916583.6 / EP0829167 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9108649 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1-5,8-12 * page 11, line 30 - page 13, line 1 * * page 21, lines 7-16 * * page 27, line 17 - page 28, line 23 * * figure 6 * [Y] 7,8; | [X]WO9511569 (CABLESHARE INC [CA]) [X] 1-12 * page 9, line 30 - page 14, line 17 * * figures 3-6 *; | [Y] - MUELLER-ROEMER F, "DIGITALES FERNSEHEN AUSWIRKUNGEN AUF DIE MEDIENLANDSCHAFT", FKT FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, FACHVERLAG SCHIELE & SCHON GMBH., BERLIN, DE, (19940601), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 1430-9947, pages 291 - 294,296, XP000457150 [Y] 7,8 * page 294, column R, line 11 - page 295, column L, line 33 * |