EP1275377 - Granulates containing liposoluble substances and process of preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APR APPLIED PHARMA RESEARCH S.A. Via Corti 5 6828 Balerna / CH | For all designated states FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | For all designated states Ipsen SPA Via Figino 16 20156 Milano / IT | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiner, Alberto Via Mentana 23/D 22100 Como / IT | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati SRL Galleria San Babila 4/c 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01202657.1 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1275377 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275377 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/10 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | RO | 22.03.2003 | Title | German: | Fettlösliche Substanzen enthaltende Granulate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2003/03] | English: | Granulates containing liposoluble substances and process of preparation thereof | [2003/03] | French: | Granules contenant des substances liposolubles et leur procédé de préparation | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4814175 (TACK JOHANNES-WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-11,13 * column 2, line 29 - line 35 *; | [X]US5985309 (EDWARDS DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 9-11 * column 22; example 5 *; | [DA]US6028065 (RAGUNATHAN NARAYAN [US], et al) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]EP1008354 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9-14 * page 6; example 4 * |