EP1284542 - Stereodecoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Ideas to The Market BV Drielindendreef 53 4839 AH Breda / NL | [2003/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasperkovitz, Wolfdietrich Georg Eikenlaan 4 5581 HA Waalre / NL | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | van Straaten, Joop Octrooibureau Van Straaten B.V. Monseigneur Bosstraat 22 5401 EB Uden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Van Straaten, Joop Octrooibureau Van Straaten B.V. Monseigneur Bosstraat 22 5401 EB Uden / NL | Application number, filing date | 01203048.2 | 12.08.2001 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284542 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H03D1/22, H04H5/00 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
H03D1/2209 (EP,US);
H04B1/1646 (EP,US);
H04H40/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STEREODEKODER | [2003/08] | English: | Stereodecoder | [2003/08] | French: | DECODEUR STEREO | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/22] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4032717 (MALLON DIETMAR) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 47 *; | [A]EP0276507 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 8, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4128045 (TELEFUNKEN SENDERTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 44 ** figures 5-7 *; | [A]US5440586 (DEN BRABER GERARD P [NL]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - column 9, line 59 * * figures 1,2 * |