EP1183998 - Driver for a rotary surgical tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grace Manufacturing Inc. 614 SR 247 Russellville Arkansas 72801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Grace Manufacturing Inc. 614 SR 247 Russellville, Arkansas 72801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grace, Jeff 74 Dogwood Rd Dover, AR 72837 / US | 02 /
Arivett, Joel Dennis 402 Rolling Green Drive Dover, AR 72837 / US | 03 /
Grace, Richard Louis 201 Gardner Lane Dover, AR 72837 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01203092.0 | 15.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | US20000651219 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 651219 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1183998 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1183998 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/1666 (EP);
A61B17/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebvorrichtung für ein rotierendes chirurgisches Werkzeug | [2002/10] | English: | Driver for a rotary surgical tool | [2002/10] | French: | Mécanisme de commande pour outil chirurgical rotatif | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5720749 (RUPP GLENN A [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 3, line 52 - column 6, line 29 * * figures 1-10 *; | [XY]US4131116 (HEDRICK JOHN R) [X] 1-3,6-9,13-18 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 18 * * figure - * [Y] 19; | [Y]US5980170 (SALYER PAUL E [US]) [Y] 19 * column 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [E]WO0166024 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-18 * page 5 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * |