Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7040002 | 09.05.2006 | B2 | US2003040439 | 27.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21863602 | 15.08.2002 | EP01203197 | 27.08.2001 | US31503801 | 28.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1289067 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | B1 | EP1289067 | 05.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01203197 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60103755T | 07.07.2005 | T2 | DE60103755D1 | 15.07.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP01203197 | 27.08.2001 |