EP1289067 - Termination of the conductor of a superconducting cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 10 20123 Milano / IT | [2004/24] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states PIRELLI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castiglioni, Walter via Orti, 6 20013 Magenta (MI) / IT | 02 /
Cavalleri, Gianangelo via Sciesa Amatore, 1 20063 Cernusco sul Naviglio (MI) / IT | 03 /
Coletta, Giacomo via Liberazione, 31/5 20068 Peschiera Borromeo (MI) / IT | 04 /
Corsaro, Pietro via XX Settembre, 2 bis 21052 Busto Arsizio (VA) / IT | 05 /
Kunze, Dirk Kunigundenstrasse 19 91056 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
Ladie', Pierluigi corso di Porta Ticinese, 69 20123 Milano / IT | 07 /
Nassi, Marco via Cibrario, 36 bis 10144 Torino / IT | 08 /
Spreafico, Sergio via Bellini, 14 22036 Erba (CO) / IT | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01203197.7 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289067 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289067 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/68 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H02G15/34 (EP);
H01R4/68 (EP);
H01R4/723 (EP);
Y02E40/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abschluss des Leiters eines supraleitenden Kabels | [2003/10] | English: | Termination of the conductor of a superconducting cable | [2003/10] | French: | Terminaison pour le conducteur d'un câble supraconducteur | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 06.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19803687 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,28-30,33,34 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0133580 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1,28-30,33,34; | EP1158543 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [ ] * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 34; figures 7,8 *; | [A]WO0039812 (PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,28-30,33,34 * page 19, line 32 - page 20, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0014827 (BICC GEN UK CABLES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 34 * page 5, line 10 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH10228933 ; | [A]JPH06104026 ; | [A]JPH03295207 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10228933 A 19980825 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD;ELECTRIC POWER DEV CO LTD; FURUKAWA ELECTRIC) [A] 34 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940713), vol. 018, no. 372, Database accession no. (E - 1577), & JP06104026 A 19940415 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 34 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920406), vol. 016, no. 134, Database accession no. (E - 1185), & JP03295207 A 19911226 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 34 * abstract * |