EP1291826 - Electronic voting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KATHOLIEKE UNIVERSITEIT NIJMEGEN Toernooiveld 1 6525 ED Nijmegen / NL | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Bartholomeus Paulus Franciscus Heyendaalseweg 97 6524 SJ Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
Oostdijk, Martijn Diederik Semmelinkstraat 28 6512 JT Nijmegen / NL | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01203355.1 | 05.09.2001 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291826 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07C13/00, G07C13/02 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G07C13/00 (EP,US);
G07C13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Abstimmsystem und Verfahren | [2003/11] | English: | Electronic voting system | [2003/11] | French: | Système de vote électronique et procédé | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5875432 (SEHR RICHARD PETER [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, lines 58-62; claims 1,5,7,8 *; | [A]US4010353 (MOLDOVAN JR MICHAEL TERRANCE, et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US4025757 (MCKAY RICHARD H, et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US6250548 (MCCLURE NEIL [US], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5758325 (LOHRY KERMIT [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 6, lines 58-62 *; | [A]WO9933029 (WAY IAN [NZ]) [A] 11 * abstract * |