EP1191283 - Pipe system for discharging flue gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterActive Bouwproducten B.V. Lichtenhorststraat 2 6942 GT Didam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states InterActive bouwprodukten B.V. Lichtenhorststraat 2 6942 GT Didam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kistemaker, Albert-Jan 616, Stokebrand 7206 EV Zutphen / NL | 02 /
Noorlander, Hans Nicolaas 116, Kerkalle 6882 AX Velp / NL | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Riemens, Roelof Harm, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Riemens, Roelof Harm, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 01203618.2 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | NL20001016246 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: NL 1016246 | [2002/13] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191283 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F23J13/04, F23J13/08 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
F23J13/04 (EP);
F23J13/08 (EP);
F23J2211/101 (EP);
F23J2213/203 (EP);
F23J2213/60 (EP);
F23J2900/13004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Title | German: | Abgasrohrsystem | [2002/13] | English: | Pipe system for discharging flue gases | [2002/13] | French: | Système de tuyaux pour gaz de combustion | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4603680 (DEMPSEY DANIEL J [US], et al) [YD] 1-3,11 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 16 - line 49; figure 5 *; | [Y]DE20006951U (REITZ EBERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-3,11 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 6; figures 2,3; claims 4,6 *; | [AP]DE20022107U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [AP] 1-3,7,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9311424U (SKOBERNE WILLI [DE]) [A] 1,9,10 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4923221 (TAYLOR KENNARD W [US]) [A] 5,6,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9111394U (VIESSMAN) [A] 1,10 * page 8, line 10 - line 12; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4603680 |