EP1199054 - Liquefracture handpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/17] | Liquefracture handpiece tip | ||
[2004/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Manufacturing Ltd. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth Texas 76134-2099 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Alcon Manufacturing Ltd. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth, Texas 76134-2099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sussman, Glenn 21942 Raintree Lane Lake Forest, California 92630 / US | 02 /
Cohen, Donald M. 17512 Luther Irvine, California 92614 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01203702.4 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | US20000690259 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 690259 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199054 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199054 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A61F9/00736 (EP,US);
A61B17/3203 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320084 (EP,US);
A61B2018/044 (EP,US);
A61B2018/046 (EP,US);
A61F9/00745 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Title | German: | Verflüssigungshandstück | [2004/01] | English: | Liquefracture handpiece | [2004/01] | French: | Pièce à main pour liquéfracture | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/17] | Spitze für Verflüssigungshandstück | ||
Former [2002/17] | Liquefracture handpiece tip | ||
Former [2002/17] | Embout de pièce à main pour liquéfracture | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03003909.3 / EP1314409 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.05.2004 | TR | 26.05.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/51] | TR | 26.05.2004 | |
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | GR | 26.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1445488 (WALLACH M) [Y] 1,5-9 * page 3, column R, line 106 - column R, line 125; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4935006 (HASSON HARRITH M [US]) [A] 1-7* column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 8; figure 5 *; | [A]US5163433 (KAGAWA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * column 8, line 23 - line 36; figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0962204 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [Y] 1,5-9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figure 7 * | by applicant | US3589363 | US4246902 | US4493694 | US4515583 | US4589415 | US4609368 | US4869715 | US5223676 |