EP1205799 - Processing photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Earle, Anthony, c/o Kodak Limited Headstone Drive, harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | 02 /
Wildman, Nigel, c/o Kodak Limited Headstone Drive, harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Barker, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01203842.8 | 11.10.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | GB20000026949 | 03.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0026949 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205799 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03D3/02, G03D3/06, G03D3/13 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G03D3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Behandlung fotografischen Materials | [2002/20] | English: | Processing photographic material | [2002/20] | French: | Traitement de matériau photosensible | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 04.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5339131 (ROSENBURGH JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [YA]US5822645 (PICCININO JR RALPH L [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]EP0859279 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5387499 (EARLE ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |