EP1197610 - Longitudinal facing, facing retainers, and facing structure having facing and facing retainers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GANTAN BEAUTY INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 36-5, Shonandai 5-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states GANTAN BEAUTY INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 36-5, Shonandai 5-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funaki, Motokatsu 403 Kameino Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamasaka, Noboru 430 Shimo-Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Nishizawa, Kazuyuki Shangri-la Shonan 101, 6-10 Shonandai 5-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01204243.8 | 22.08.1996 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950239074 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: JP 23907495 | JP19950243972 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: JP 24397295 | JP19950313686 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31368695 | JP19960084494 | 14.03.1996 Original published format: JP 8449496 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197610 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197610 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/366 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
E04D3/366 (EP,US);
E04D2003/3612 (EP);
E04D2003/3615 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2002/16] | Title | German: | Längserstreckende Verkleidung, Verkleidungshalterung und Verkleidungsbauweise mit Verkleidung und Verkleidungshalterungen | [2002/16] | English: | Longitudinal facing, facing retainers, and facing structure having facing and facing retainers | [2002/16] | French: | Revêtement étendu longitudinalement, éléments de retenue et structure de revêtement comportant un revêtement et des éléments de retenue | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96306124.7 / EP0787868 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05156755 ; | [Y]JPH0238653 ; | [Y]JPH03212553 ; | [A]US4388789 (MURPHY WESLEY T [US]) [A] 7 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 50 ** figures 1-3 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931007), vol. 017, no. 558, Database accession no. (M - 1493), & JP05156755 A 19930622 (GANTAN BEAUTY KOGYO KK) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [Y] 2,5-7,9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900423), vol. 014, no. 198, Database accession no. (M - 0965), & JP02038653 A 19900208 (FUNAKI SHOJI KK) [Y] 2,5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911212), vol. 015, no. 491, Database accession no. (M - 1190), & JP03212553 A 19910918 (GANTAN BIYUUT KOGYO KK) [Y] 7,9 * abstract * |