EP1193910 - Implementing a continued packet-switched radio connection by informing the base station that a continued uplink TBF (Temporary Block Flow) connection is necessary [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/14] | Method and devices for implementing a continued packet-switched radio connection | ||
[2004/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [2009/30] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forssell, Mika Bertel Jungin Aukio 4 C 40 02600 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Gronberg, Petri Puistopiha 2A 18 02610 Espoo / FI | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01204507.6 | 11.01.2000 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | FI19990000039 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: FI 990039 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193910 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193910 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193910 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1193910 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H04W76/25 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/0875 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2011/21] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2002/14] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Durchführung einer fortlaufenden paketvermittelten Funkverbindung durch Benachrichtigen der Basisstation, dass eine fortlaufende uplink TBF (Temporary Block Flow) Verbindung notwendig ist | [2008/24] | English: | Implementing a continued packet-switched radio connection by informing the base station that a continued uplink TBF (Temporary Block Flow) connection is necessary | [2008/24] | French: | Implementation d'une connection radio continue par paquets en informant la station de base qu'une connection continue uplink TBF (Temporary Block Flow) est nécessaire | [2008/24] |
Former [2002/14] | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Durchführung einer fortlaufenden paketvermittelten Funkverbindung | ||
Former [2002/14] | Method and devices for implementing a continued packet-switched radio connection | ||
Former [2002/14] | Procédé et dispositifs permettant d'une connexion radio par paquets continu | Examination procedure | 13.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00300178.1 / EP1021017 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5574774 (AHLBERG BJOERN G D [SE], et al); | [A]US5708656 (NONEMAN JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US5802472 (TANIGUCHI KEIICHI [JP]); | [A]WO9844639 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]EP0872982 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [E]EP1045559 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); |