EP1221286 - Method for the preparation of oil having increased polyphenol content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/28] | Oil having increased polyphenol content | ||
[2004/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2005/08] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Husken, Henk, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Kooij, Stephanie, Unilever Research Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
van Putte, Karel Petrus, Unilever Res. Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Kleiborn, Paul Erik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kleiborn, Paul Erik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2005/01] | Kleiborn, Paul Erik, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2002/28] | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 01204537.3 | 26.11.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | EP20000204714 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00204714 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221286 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221286 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A23D9/007, A23D7/00, A23L1/24 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
A23D9/007 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23L27/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Öl mit erhöhtem Polyphenolgehalt | [2004/35] | English: | Method for the preparation of oil having increased polyphenol content | [2004/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'huile avec un taux de polyphénoles augmenté | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/28] | Öl mit erhöhtem Polyphenolgehalt | ||
Former [2002/28] | Oil having increased polyphenol content | ||
Former [2002/28] | Huile avec un taux de polyphénoles augmenté | Examination procedure | 22.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | BE | 26.01.2005 | CH | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | DE | 27.04.2005 | [2006/22] |
Former [2006/18] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 26.01.2005 | |
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0038541 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [XD] 10-14 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 11; claims 1-12 * * page 8, line 17 - page 11, line 30 *; | [XA]US5998641 (GANGULI KESHAB LAL [NL], et al) [X] 10-14 * column 2, line 9 - line 10; claims 1-19 * * column 3, line 61 - line 63 * [A] 1-9; | [XDA]US6162480 (VAN BUUREN JAN [NL], et al) [XD] 10-14 * examples 1-3 * * column 1, line 54 - line 59; claims 1-13 * [A] 1-9; | [X]EP0849353 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 10-14 * examples 1-4; claims 1-18 *; | [XA]WO9732947 (COMITER TRADING & SERVICES S R [IT], et al) [X] 10-14 * claims 2,10,20 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP1013752 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 10-14 * claims 1-15 * [A] 1-9; | [XDA]FR2337509 (CHAZALET HENRI [FR]) [XD] 12 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 7; claims 1-4 * [A] 1-11,13,14; | [XDA]FR2499368 (FROMENT MICHEL DE [FR]) [XD] 12 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 12; claims 1-5 * [A] 1-11,13,14; | [XA]WO0036936 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 12-14 * claims 2-8 * [A] 1-11 |