EP1186431 - Printing textile using an ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Color Wings B.V. Looweg 12B 7741 EH Coevorden / NL | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hindriks, Jakobus Uithof 3 7761 XN Schoonebeek / NL | 02 /
Hollanders, Peter St. Steverusstraat 26 5616 NZ Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Dorsch, Andreas Thomas Ewaldstrasse 24 44625 Herne / DE | 04 /
Pennekamp, Richard Arnoud Otto Ihmerterstrasse 228C 58675 Hemer / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01204663.7 | 19.03.1999 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | NL19981008641 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: NL 1008641 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186431 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186431 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41J15/16 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
B41J15/165 (EP,US);
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J15/005 (EP,US);
B41J15/16 (EP,US);
B41J3/4078 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | B41J15/16, B41J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2002/11] | Title | German: | Bedrucken von Textilien mittels eines Tintenstrahldruckers | [2002/11] | English: | Printing textile using an ink jet printer | [2002/11] | French: | Impression de textile à l'aide d'une imprimante à jet d'encre | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99910878.0 / EP1062095 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0666180 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,6,7* column 52, paragraph L - column 53, line 19; figures 43A,43B * | by applicant | EP0633345 | EP0633346 | EP0633347 |