EP1318011 - Multi-layer sheet comprising a protective polyurethane layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Iris c/o 3M Europe s.a., Hermeslaan 7 B1831 Diegem / BE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 01204788.2 | 07.12.2001 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318011 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318011 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B32B27/40 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/30 (US);
B32B27/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2369/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Folie, die eine Polyurethanschutzschicht enthält | [2003/24] | English: | Multi-layer sheet comprising a protective polyurethane layer | [2003/24] | French: | Feuille multicouche comprenant une couche protectrice de polyuréthane | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 23.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | CY | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | TR | 22.09.2004 | IE | 07.12.2004 | LU | 07.12.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
LU | 07.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0416765 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,2,9,10 * * page 2, line 32 - line 45 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 18 ** example 1 *; | [DA]EP1004608 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-12 * claims 1-8,11-13,16-19 * * page 2, line 45 - line 49 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 57 * * example 1 * |