EP1197240 - Steerable catheter comprising a rotatable control mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/16] | Rotatable control mechanism for steerable catheter | ||
[2005/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | [2006/08] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falwell, Gary S. c/o C.R. Bard Inc., 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2002/16] | 01 /
Falwell, Gary S. c/o C.R. Bard Inc., 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersex / US | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/16] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01205104.1 | 17.03.1998 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | US19970818353 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 818353 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197240 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197240 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197240 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/16] | Title | German: | Steuerbarer Katheter mit rotierbarem Kontrollmechanismus | [2005/38] | English: | Steerable catheter comprising a rotatable control mechanism | [2005/38] | French: | Cathéter orientable comprenant un méchanisme de commande rotatif | [2005/38] |
Former [2002/16] | Rotierbarer Kontrollmechanismus für steuerbaren Katheter | ||
Former [2002/16] | Rotatable control mechanism for steerable catheter | ||
Former [2002/16] | Mécanisme de commande rotatif de cathéter orientable | Examination procedure | 26.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98911769.2 / EP1019133 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.02.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 22.02.2006 | |
NL | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | NL | 22.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3470876 (BARCHILON JOHN) [A] 10 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 20 ** figures 4-8 *; | [Y]US3921295 (JAMES JOHN OLIVER) [Y] 1-5,8 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 25 * * figures 5-7 *; | [YA]EP0521595 (LUNDQUIST INGEMAR H [US]) [Y] 1-5,8 * column 28, line 34 - column 30, line 4 * * figures 35A-35C,47-50 * [A] 10; | [X]EP0585473 (MAEDA IND [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 1 * * column 9, line 18 - line 26 * * figures 5,9 * | by applicant | US5358478 | US5383852 | US5395327 |