EP1122952 - Device for and method of converting a frame rate in a moving picture decoder, and a record medium and an integrated circuit device for implementing such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Takeshi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250032.8 | 30.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | JP20000023405 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000023405 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122952 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122952 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
H04N7/0112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/48] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Umwandlung der Bildfrequenz in einem Bewegtbilddekoder; Aufzeichnungsmedium und integrierte Halbleiterschaltung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [2001/32] | English: | Device for and method of converting a frame rate in a moving picture decoder, and a record medium and an integrated circuit device for implementing such a method | [2001/32] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de conversion de la fréquence de trame dans un décodeur d'images en mouvement; média d'enregistrement et circuit intégré semi-conducteur pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10336595 ; | [A]US4609941 (CARR MICHAEL D [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [X]EP0588669 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 12, line 45 - page 13, line 35 *; | [X]EP0933942 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 34 - column 4, line 41 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 39 * * column 19, line 26 - column 22, line 33 * * claims 1-14 *; | [PX]US6157739 (YAZAWA MINOBU [JP], et al) [PX] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 26 - column 4, line 12 * * column 6, line 55 - column 10, line 60 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 3, & JP10336595 A 19981218 (MITSUBISHI) [X] 1-12 * column A * |