EP1136250 - Method and device for glueing together webs of fibrous sheet material, such as paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smurfit Europa Carton GmbH Tilsiter Str. 144 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Europa Carton Aktiengesellschaft Spitalerstrasse 11 20095 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Norbert Alfons-Schulz-Strasse 81 41066 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Krause, Horst Alfons-Schulz-Strasse 66 41066 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
Krause, Norbert Alfons-Schulz-Strasse 81 41066 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
02 /
Kraus, Horst Tupenweg 12 41066 Mönchengladbach / DE | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250084.9 | 13.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | DE2000205220U | 14.03.2000 Original published format: DE 20005220 U | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136250 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136250 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/28, B32B31/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B31F1/2818 (EP);
B32B37/0015 (EP);
B32B2038/047 (EP);
B32B2317/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenkleben von aufeinanderzubewegten Bahnen aus blattartigem Fasermaterial wie Papier | [2001/39] | English: | Method and device for glueing together webs of fibrous sheet material, such as paper | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour coller des bandes d'un matériau en feuille fibreux, comme papier | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 03.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.06.2004 | IE | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | TR | 09.06.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
IT | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 09.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56101833 ; | [DXY]US1957732 (WILLIAM ROWE) [DX] 1,9-11,14,18 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 14 * * page 2, column L, line 63 - column R, line 111; figure 1 * [Y] 12-16,20-22; | [A]CH605100 (WERNLI PIERRE); | [DY]US5372494 (VAUGHAN DONALD E [US]) [DY] 12-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 17; figure - *; | [DY]DE19603015 (EUROPA CARTON AG [DE]) [DY] 20-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811110), vol. 005, no. 174, Database accession no. (M - 096), & JP56101833 A 19810814 (TOKIWA LEATHER KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * |