05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
12.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
20.10.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
18.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
21.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
02.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
05.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
28.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
22.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.10.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
19.10.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
20.02.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
03.10.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |