Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50108359D1 | 19.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10027782 | 07.06.2000 | DE50108359 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161922 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2005 | B1 | EP1161922 | 19.11.2003 | A3 | EP1161922 | 12.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10027782 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE312551T | 15.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10027782 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10027782 | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10027782 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002068867 | 06.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10027782 | 07.06.2000 |