EP1201356 - Method and apparatus for grinding a glass base material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kase, Hirofumi, c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Koide, Hiroyuki, c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6170-27, Hamamo, Okunoya Kamisu-machi, Kashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250377.7 | 25.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | JP20000327262 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000327262 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201356 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201356 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24B5/04, B24B49/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B24B5/045 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
B24B49/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/04] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schleifen eines Materials aus Glas | [2002/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for grinding a glass base material | [2002/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de meulage d'une préforme en verre | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0976689 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,10 * page 4, line 44 - page 5, line 10; figures 2-4 *; | [D]JP2000047039 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |