EP1345531 - LANCET FOR SKIN PRICKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Woodstock, Oxfordshire OX20 1TU / GB | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Woodstock, Oxford OX20 1TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICKNELL, Stephen 1 Compton Scorpion Cottages Ilmington Shipston on Stour Warwickshire CV36 4PJ / GB | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/39] | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01270274.2 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001GB05433 | Priority number, date | GB20000030489 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0030489 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247550 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345531 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345531 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150297 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LANZETTE FÜR HAUTSTICHE | [2003/39] | English: | LANCET FOR SKIN PRICKERS | [2003/39] | French: | LANCETTE DESTINEE A PIQUER LA PEAU | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Request for further processing for: | 11.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9602189 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,9 * page 5, lines 14-19; figure 4; claims 9-11 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0589186 (APLS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 8, lines 29-46 * * column 10, lines 3-30 * * figures 3,4,11 * |