EP1389134 - SOFT TISSUE IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aortech International PLC Phoenix Crescent, Strathclyde Business Park Bellshill ML4 3NJ / GB | [2004/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, David, F. Hayden Cottage Castlehill Farm Kingsley Nr Frodsham Sheshire WA6 6JS / GB | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/08] | McNally, Roisin, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01270352.6 | 17.12.2001 | [2004/08] | WO2001GB05575 | Priority number, date | GB20000030635 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0030635 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247740 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389134 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/34, A61L27/18, A61F2/12 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61F2/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L75/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHTTEIL-IMPLANTAT | [2004/08] | English: | SOFT TISSUE IMPLANT | [2004/08] | French: | IMPLANT DE TISSU MOU | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 04.08.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4205401 (FRISCH ELDON E [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4592755 (PENTON HAROLD R [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 11 *; | [X]FR2624725 (VERDOUX ELISABETH [FR]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * claim - *; | [X]US4960425 (YAN JOHN Y J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 31 - column 4, line 63 * * column 8, line 5 - line 45 * * claim - *; | [X]US5116370 (FOGLIETTI MARK A [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 39 - line 48 * * claim - *; | [X]US5376117 (PINCHUK LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 59 * * claim - *; | [X]US5522896 (PRESCOTT ANTHONY D [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 28 - line 57 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 15 * * figure 2C *; | [X]US5545221 (HANG-FU LEE [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 29 - line 46 * * claim - *; | [X]US5630844 (DOGAN AYDIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 30 * * column 13, line 10 - line 22 * * claim - *; | [X]US5632774 (BABIAN HAMIK [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 45 - line 52 * * column 4, line 3 - line 16 ** example 1 *; | [X]US6066220 (SCHNEIDER-NIESKENS REINHOLD [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 17 - line 25 * * column 4, line 16 - line 27 * |