EP1345493 - FUNGICIDE MIXTURES BASED ON AMIDE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICKEN, Karl Am Hüttenwingert 12 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
PTOCK, Arne Tiroler Str. 33 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
AMMERMANN, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Str. 2 64646 Heppenheim / DE | 04 /
STIERL, Reinhard, Dr. Jahnstr. 8 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 05 /
LORENZ, Gisela Erlenweg 13 67434 Hambach / DE | 06 /
STRATHMANN, Siegfried Donnersbergstrasse 9 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
SCHERER, Maria Hermann-Jürgens-Strasse 30 76829 Landau / DE | 08 /
SCHELBERGER, Klaus Traminerweg 2 67161 Gönnheim / DE | 09 /
HAMPEL, Manfred Im Biengarten 15 67435 Neustadt / DE | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
EICKEN, Karl Am Hüttenwingert 12 67157 Wachenheim / DE | ||
02 /
PTOCK, Arne Tiroler Str. 33 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
AMMERMANN, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Str. 2 64646 Heppenheim / DE | |||
04 /
STIERL, Reinhard Ginsterstr. 17 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | |||
05 /
LORENZ, Gisela Erlenweg 13 67434 Hambach / DE | |||
06 /
STRATHMANN, Siegfried Donnersbergstrasse 9 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
07 /
SCHERER, Maria Hermann-Jürgens-Strasse 30 76829 Landau / DE | |||
08 /
SCHELBERGER, Klaus Traminerweg 2 67161 Gönnheim / DE | |||
09 /
HAMPEL, Manfred Im Biengarten 15 67435 Neustadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01271095.0 | 13.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP14651 | Priority number, date | DE2000163047 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063047 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249435 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345493 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345493 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/40, // (A01N43/40, 43:90), A01N43:50 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N43/90, A01N43/80, A01N43/50 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 18.07.2003 | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE MISCHUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON AMIDVERBINDUNGEN | [2003/39] | English: | FUNGICIDE MIXTURES BASED ON AMIDE COMPOUNDS | [2003/39] | French: | MELANGES FONGICIDES SE BASANT SUR DES COMPOSES D'AMIDE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.11.2005 | TR | 09.11.2005 | CY | 13.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | LU | 09.01.2006 | GR | 10.02.2006 | [2015/21] |
Former [2013/07] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 13.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
GR | 10.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 13.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
GR | 10.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 13.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0298196 (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9706171 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] * the whole document *; | [AD]US5824705 (MUELLER BERND [DE], et al) [AD] * the whole document * |