|
07.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.01.2003 |
|
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |