13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
27.01.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
04.02.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
07.07.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2004 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
18.06.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
10.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
First examination report |
|
12.09.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
12.09.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
30.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|