Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6957165 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2005 | B2 | US2004074112 | 22.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004520102 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2103102 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1355549 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2005 | B1 | EP1355549 | 29.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE291357T | 15.04.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2432712 | 27.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60109648T | 02.02.2006 | T2 | DE60109648D1 | 28.04.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS6854 | 19.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20032804L | 06.08.2003 | L | NO20032804D0 | 19.06.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | IS0100023 | 19.12.2001 | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0249473 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2002 | A3 | WO0249473 | 27.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1525824 | 01.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1355549T | 08.08.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2240338T | 16.10.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1355549E | 31.08.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2003123125 | 27.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | IS5785 | 21.12.2000 |