EP1346951 - METHOD OF RECOVERING ENRICHED GASEOUS OXYGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | [2007/31] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, M., c/o Sumitomo Seiko Chemicals Co. Ltd Engineering Division, 46-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho, KKako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | 02 /
SASANO, H., c/o Sumitomo Seika Chemicals Co. Ltd Engineering Division, 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho, Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | 03 /
HARUNA, K., c/o Sumitomo Seika Chemicals Co. Ltd Engineering Division, 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho, Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/39] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271327.7 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001JP11008 | Priority number, date | JP20000385189 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000385189 | [2003/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249959 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346951 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346951 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/02, B01D53/053 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (KR);
B01D53/053 (EP,US);
C01B13/0259 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON ANGEREICHERTEM, GASFÖRMIGEN SAUERSTOFF | [2003/39] | English: | METHOD OF RECOVERING ENRICHED GASEOUS OXYGEN | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'OXYGENE GAZEUX ENRICHI | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | Translation filed | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]EP0771583 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [X]US3788036 (STAHL D, et al); | [X]EP0705636 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]EP0641591 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]JP2000237522 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD) |