04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
15.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
23.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
31.03.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
11.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
08.04.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.02.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.01.2005 |
First examination report |
|
13.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
23.02.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.08.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
08.08.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|